+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 15, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-332.
- Signed by President.
On October 5, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 860.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth without amendment. Without written report.
On September 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 9, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from Office of Federal Procurement Policy.
On June 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs received executive comment from GAO.
On April 27, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs requested executive comment from GSA; NASA; GAO; Office of Federal Procurement Policy; Transportation Department.
On March 31, 1982 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Federal Expenditures.
On March 25, 1982 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On March 23, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 356 - 43 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On March 11, 1982 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 275.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Government Operations. Report No: 97-456.
On March 4, 1982 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 24, 1982 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 28, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 9, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, GAO, GSA, OMB.
On March 17, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor