+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-152.
On July 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On July 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Mr. Huizenga asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.2553 Amendment SA 2553 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Gillibrand. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.2553 Amendment SA 2553 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On October 26, 2011 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 416 - 3 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 25, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Pearce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2527 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy and Technology.
On July 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Budget
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2553
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsors (296)
Type:
Primary Sponsor