+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 5, 1979 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-104.
- Signed by President.
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On November 5, 1979 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On November 1, 1979 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 1, 1979 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
On October 12, 1979 in the Senate:
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On October 11, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-364.
On September 26, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Banking, Housing and Urban Affairs.
On September 24, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On February 28, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor