+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 19, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 106-316.
On October 12, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 6, 2000 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 904.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Smith, of NH without amendment. With written report No. 106-457 .
On September 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On October 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 26, 1999 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2496 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 18, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 227.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-390 .
On October 6, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans Discharged.
On September 23, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 16, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On July 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor