+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On July 26, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 26, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, Commerce.
On April 19, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, USDA, Commerce, DOD, DOE, HHS, DOT, Interior, State, Justice, CEQ, EPA, USTR.
On April 18, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 12, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor