+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
On September 10, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Hastings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2489 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-605 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 440.
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor