+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 29, 2002 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-253.
- Signed by President.
On October 23, 2002 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 17, 2002 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 16, 2002 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 16, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 698.
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Hollings without amendment. With written report No. 107-310 .
On September 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On July 11, 2002 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 473 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 473 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2486 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill . Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 473 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Jack Quinn to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2486 .
- H.AMDT.526 Amendment offered by Ms. Jackson-Lee . Amendment authorizes $100,000 for the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to conduct a three year study to assess the long-term trends in frequency and severity of inland flooding and to determine how shifts in climate and other factors might make certain regions vulnerable to escalating flood damage in the future.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with debate on the Jackson-Lee amendment under the five-minute rule.
- H.AMDT.526 On agreeing to the Jackson-Lee amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- POSTPONED VOTE - At the conclusion of debate the Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 2486 by voice vote and announced that the bill had passed. Mr. Ehlers then demanded the yeas and nays. The Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 413 - 3 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On July 9, 2002 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 473 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2486 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Science now printed in the bill . Measure will be considered read. Bill is open to amendments.
On June 5, 2002 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 107-495 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 295.
On May 22, 2002 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 12, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 11, 2001 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 18, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards.
On July 12, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.526
Amendment authorizes $100,000 for the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to conduct a three year study to assess the long-term trends in frequency and severity of inland flooding and to determine how shifts in climate and other factors might make certain regions vulnerable to escalating flood damage in the future.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor