+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 13, 1981 in the House:
- Other Measure S.1003 Passed House in Lieu.
- Laid on Table in House by Unanimous Consent.
- Laid on Table in House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
On May 18, 1981 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 38.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 97-52.
On April 30, 1981 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On April 20, 1981 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From EPA.
On April 13, 1981 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On March 17, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On March 12, 1981 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Oceanography.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fish and Wildlife.
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, EPA.
On March 11, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor