+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 21, 2002 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Signed by President.
On August 13, 2002 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 2, 2002 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 450.
On June 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 107-182 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
On December 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On December 11, 2001 in the House:
- Mr. Gilchrest moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 107-330 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 202.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2440 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 28, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 15, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 19, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On July 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor