+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-193.
- Signed by President.
On February 7, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On February 6, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On February 5, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On February 5, 1980 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On January 31, 1980 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #18 .
On December 19, 1979 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-715.
On November 16, 1979 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
- Motion to instruct House conferees passed House, roll call #671 .
On October 22, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On October 22, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On September 25, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Public Works and Transportation with amendment, H. Rept. 96-475.
On February 27, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor