+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 23, 1997 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 105-259 , Part I.
On September 17, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 11, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 9, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology.
On September 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to House Small Business
- Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor