+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 115-302.
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H9673)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2422.
- Mr. Burgess moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9673-9675)
On October 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.Amdt.4057 Amendment SA 4057 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4057 Amendment SA 4057 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6881; text: CR S6881) In the nature of a substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6880-6881)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1247-1248)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 13 (Roll no. 82). (text: CR H1243)
- Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1243-1244)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2422.
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 238.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-328.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 4057
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.4057
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor