+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On July 13, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 12, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 5, 1989 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held in Denver, Colorado
On June 2, 1989 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held in San Jose, California, Prior to Introduction
- Field Hearings Held in Cambridge, Ohio, Prior to Introduction
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT and OMB.
On June 1, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On May 18, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor