+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On October 6, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Navy.
On May 10, 1983 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Federal Maritime Comm.
On April 27, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Federal Maritime Comm.
On April 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, Navy, Federal Maritime Comm.
On April 5, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor