+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-231.
- Signed by President.
On December 29, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 21, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 21, 1987 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
On December 20, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.1369 Amendment SP 1369 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1369 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Leahy. To extend the authorization of the Renewable Resources Extension Act.
On July 28, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On July 27, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 147.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-239.
On July 23, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 21, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 15, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 13, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1369
To extend the authorization of the Renewable Resources Extension Act.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor