+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On September 28, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
On July 20, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology and Economic Growth, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On July 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On July 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Rural Development and Research.
On June 29, 2001 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 28, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Agriculture, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor