+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 24, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-521.
- Signed by President.
On October 14, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 13, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 6, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3419 Amendment SP 3419 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3419 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Leahy. In the nature of a substitute.
On July 28, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On July 27, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-241.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 149.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On July 23, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 7, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From 1350.
On June 9, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 18, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 13, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3419
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor