+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.4286 Amendment SA 4286 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4286 Amendment SA 4286 proposed by Senator Kyl for Senator Bond. To provide for a complete substitute.
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On September 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H. Res. 590 .
On July 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3944 Amendment SA 3944 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3944 Amendment SA 3944 proposed by Senator Burns for Senator Bond. To provide a complete substitute.
- Measure laid before Senate.
On May 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
- Committee on Small Business. Reported to Senate by Senator Bond with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-289 .
On March 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee on Small Business. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2392 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Kelly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 23, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 193.
- Committee on Science discharged.
- House Committee on Science Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 23, 1999.
- Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 106-329 , Part I.
On July 1, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 30, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to House Small Business
- Referred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.3944
To provide a complete substitute.
S.AMDT.4286
To provide for a complete substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor