+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 30, 2005 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-79.
- Signed by President.
On September 29, 2005 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 27, 2005 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 26, 2005 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate vitiated previous referral and discharge by Unanimous Consent.
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On July 13, 2005 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Turner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2385 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 12, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
- Reported by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 109-164 .
On June 16, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 2005 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 17, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federalism and the Census.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor