+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On August 23, 1988 in the House:
- Provisions of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.4848 .
On July 16, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
On June 23, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On May 21, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, ITC, USTR.
On May 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On May 12, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor