+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-177. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On October 9, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5881)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4043-4044)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2372.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4043-4045)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-72.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor