+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2012 in the House:
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
- Committee on Intelligence discharged.
- Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 510.
On September 12, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-665 , Part I.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 30, 2012.
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 30, 2012.
- House Committee on Foreign Affairs Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 30, 2012.
- House Committee on Intelligence Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 30, 2012.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology for a period ending not later than Nov. 30, 2012 for consideration of such provision of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1, rule X.
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies Discharged.
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
On June 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On June 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Foreign Affairs, and Intelligence , for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Intelligence
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor