+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 207.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 109-378 .
On July 20, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 23.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
On June 28, 2005 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 23, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor