+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 30, 2009 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-36.
- Signed by President.
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Mr. Johnson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2344 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 8, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 71.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-139 .
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.