+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 28, 2003 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-61.
- Signed by President.
On July 22, 2003 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 17, 2003 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 16, 2003 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 1.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On July 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 15, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 418 - 2, 1 Present .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On July 14, 2003 in the House:
- Mr. Leach moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2330 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
On July 11, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 108-159 , Part II.
On July 9, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 7, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 11, 2003.
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 11, 2003.
- House Committee on Financial Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 11, 2003.
On June 23, 2003 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims Discharged.
On June 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 7, 2003.
- House Committee on Financial Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 7, 2003.
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 7, 2003.
- Reported by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 108-159 , Part I.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On June 12, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House International Relations
- Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor