+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2005 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-33.
- Signed by President.
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 29, 2005 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On June 13, 2005 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2326 .
- Mr. Duncan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 370 - 0 .
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor