+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 19, 1994 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-710, Part I.
On August 5, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 1994 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, HHS.
On July 1, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On June 7, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
On May 27, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor