+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On December 29, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-225.
- Signed by President.
On December 22, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 20, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 20, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On December 19, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry, S. Rept. 93-652.
On June 19, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture and Forestry.
On June 18, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On May 29, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Agriculture, H. Rept. 93-233.
On January 18, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor