+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On July 30, 2007 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 23 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 27, 2007 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 110-269 , Part I.
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
On July 17, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
On March 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (243)
Type:
Primary Sponsor