+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 14, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 483.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-671 .
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsors (173)
Type:
Primary Sponsor