+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 22, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 103-385.
On October 18, 1994 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 12, 1994 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 8, 1994 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 21, 1993 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Miss Collins moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as Agreed to by recorded vote : 422 - 4 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Solomon objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On August 4, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 28, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services.
On May 26, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Vote
September 21, 1993: SUSPEND THE RULES AND PASS, AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 422
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor