+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8801)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2278.
- Mr. McKinley moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8801-8802)
On September 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-925.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 718.
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor