+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 11, 2003 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-113.
- Signed by President.
On November 3, 2003 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 30, 2003 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 29, 2003 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 338.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On October 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On June 16, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 369 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2254 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Carter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 2, 2003 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On May 22, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor