+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H788-791)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2247.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H788-796)
- Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-290.
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House