+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On July 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 13, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On June 30, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Economic Growth, Natural Resources and Regulatory Affairs.
On June 16, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor