+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On June 25, 1985 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
On June 24, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 23, 1985 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 90.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 99-143.
On May 9, 1985 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 2, 1985 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 30, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On April 25, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor