+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 26, 1994 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-312.
- Signed by President.
On August 15, 1994 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 12, 1994 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 11, 1994 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Voice Vote.
On July 26, 1994 in the House:
- Conference papers: message on House action held at the desk in Senate.
On July 25, 1994 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On July 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Mr. Swift moved to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report, H. Rept. 103-617.
On July 25, 1994 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference papers: Senate report and managers' statement held at the desk in Senate.
On July 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference report H. Rept. 103-617 filed.
On July 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
On October 6, 1993 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- Senate insists on its amendment agrees to request for a conference, appoints conferees Hollings; Ford; Bryan; Danforth; Gorton.
On September 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House requests a conference.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The Speaker appointed conferees: Dingell, Swift, Manton, Moorhead, and Oxley.
- On motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and request a conference Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Swift asked unanimous consent that the House disagree to the Senate amendment, and request a conference.
On September 27, 1993 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 1179 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 1179 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On June 21, 1993 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Swift moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 17, 1993 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 76.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 103-138.
On June 8, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 27, 1993 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 26, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
On May 24, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor