+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On July 14, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 29, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On June 18, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On June 4, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, ITC.
On May 13, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Procurement and Military Nuclear Systems.
On May 12, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On May 7, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On April 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor