+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 24, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 100-646 .
On May 5, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 29, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held. Hearings printed: H. Hrg. 100-27.
On July 21, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, OMB.
On July 9, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Aviation.
On May 7, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness.
On May 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On April 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor