+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms under the authority of the order of May 22, 98 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
On May 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On November 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On November 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On November 9, 1997 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 302 .
- H.AMDT.477 Amendment in the nature of a substitute by the Committee on International Relations considered as adopted pursuant to H. Res. 302 . An amendment in the nature of a substitute made in order by the provisions of H. Res. 302 and agreed to pursuant to the same.
- H.AMDT.477 On agreeing to the International Relations amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2358 , H.R. 2232 , H.R. 2195 , H. Res. 188 and H.R. 967 . Providing for the sequential consideration in the House of the following measures: H.R. 2358 , H.R. 2232 , H.R. 2195 , H. Res. 188 , H.R. 967 , H.R. 2570 , H.R. 2386 , H.R. 2605 , and H.R. 2647 . One hour of general debate is provided for each measure. Specified amendments are in order.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS ON FINAL PASSAGE - At the conclusion of debate on the bill, H.R. 2232 , the Chair put the question on final passage and by voice vote, declared that the ayes had prevailed. Subsequently, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the day.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 401 - 21 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 4, 1997 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 302 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2358 , H.R. 2232 , H.R. 2195 , H. Res. 188 and H.R. 967 . Providing for the sequential consideration in the House of the following measures: H.R. 2358 , H.R. 2232 , H.R. 2195 , H. Res. 188 , H.R. 967 , H.R. 2570 , H.R. 2386 , H.R. 2605 , and H.R. 2647 . One hour of general debate is provided for each measure. Specified amendments are in order.
On October 6, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 175.
- Reported by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 105-303 .
On September 29, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 26, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from State.
On September 25, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 24, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State.
On August 21, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
On July 23, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.477
An amendment in the nature of a substitute made in order by the provisions of
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor