+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3187-3206)
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-73.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 51.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2225.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3222-3223)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 345 - 67 (Roll no. 186).(text: CR H3187-3202)
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 345 - 67 (Roll no. 186). (text: CR H3187-3202)
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E305)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor