+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 341.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-196.
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6005-6006)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2223.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6005-6006)
- Mr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 196.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-258.
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor