+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On October 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 97-56.
On September 24, 1981 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On September 22, 1981 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 27, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 259.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Wallop under the authority of the order of Aug 3, 81 favorably without amendment. With written report No. 97-186.
On July 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 512 without amendment favorably.
On July 22, 1981 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 20, 1981 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
On July 9, 1981 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 97-169.
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 6.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 117.
On June 24, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 4, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 18, 1981 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On March 30, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On March 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and National Parks.
On February 26, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor