+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 333.
- Committee on Intelligence (Permanent) discharged.
- Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
- Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-413, Part I.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (219)
Type:
Primary Sponsor