+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-390.
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor