+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 110-386 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
On October 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On October 22, 2007 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-391 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 245.
- Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2197 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 10, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On May 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor