+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 8, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 443.
On February 6, 1990 in the House:
- H.AMDT.367 On agreeing to the House Administration amendment Agreed to by voice vote. Amendment in the nature of a substitute
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 309 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2190 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. In lieu of the amendments now printed in the bill, it shall be in order to consider an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of the amendment printed in the report of the Committee on Rules accompanying this resolution as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. No amendment to said substitute shall be in order except the amendments printed in the Congressional Record on or before February 5, 1990, by and if offered by, Mr. Michel of Illinois or his designee. Said amendments shall be considered en bloc and shall not be subject to a demand for a division of th...
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 309 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable William J. Hughes to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 309 , the Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of debate on the amendments en bloc offered by Mr. Michel's designee, Mr. Roberts of Kansas.
- H.AMDT.366 On agreeing to the Roberts amendments Failed by recorded vote: 129 - 291 .
- H.AMDT.366 Amendments offered by Mr. Roberts. Amendments en bloc sought to: 1) make voluntary rather than mandatory the voter registration requirements placed on States; 2) preserve stronger State antifraud provisions where applicable; 3) authorize $120 million for a three year bloc grant program for the States; and 4) change the effective date from 1993 to 1991.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2190 .
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 156 - 265 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- On passage Passed by recorded vote: 289 - 132 .
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- The previous question was ordered without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with ten minutes of debate on the motion to recommit the bill to the Committee on House Administration with instructions that the bill be reported back with amendments which would allow some provision for formal authentication of mail-in registration ; eliminate the provisions of the bill requiring voter registration locations to accept completed applications for transmittal to State election officials; add to the bill's enforcement provisions penalties for the offer of payment for voting, filing false information on an election campaign report, and for using the mail for the purpose of perpetuating such fraud.
- Mr. Gillmor moved to recommit with instructions to House Administration.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
On January 31, 1990 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 309 passed House.
On January 30, 1990 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 309 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2190 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. In lieu of the amendments now printed in the bill, it shall be in order to consider an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of the amendment printed in the report of the Committee on Rules accompanying this resolution as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. No amendment to said substitute shall be in order except the amendments printed in the Congressional Record on or before February 5, 1990, by and if offered by, Mr. Michel of Illinois or his designee. Said amendments shall be considered en bloc and shall not be subject to a demand for a division of th...
On September 18, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 154.
- Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 101-243.
On May 3, 1989 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On May 2, 1989 in the House:
- For Previous Action See H.R.15 .
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.366
Amendments en bloc sought to: 1) make voluntary rather than mandatory the voter registration requirements placed on States; 2) preserve stronger State antifraud provisions where applicable; 3) authorize $120 million for a three year bloc grant program for the States; and 4) change the effective date from 1993 to 1991.
H.AMDT.367
Amendment in the nature of a substitute.
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 1990: On Motion to Recommit with Instructions
- Yeas: 156
- Nays: 265
- Absent: 10
February 6, 1990: On Passage
- Yeas: 289
- Nays: 132
- Absent: 10
February 6, 1990: ON AGREEING TO THE AMENDMENTS
- Yeas: 129
- Nays: 291
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor