+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On June 22, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from FEC.
On May 22, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and Finance.
On May 19, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB and Postal Service.
On May 18, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services.
On May 10, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Elections.
On May 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor