+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On September 8, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On June 17, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 15, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On June 14, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor