+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-468 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 328.
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
On June 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor